IL HB4155 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates the following credits for taxpayers who manufacture electric vehicles, batteries for electric vehicles, or both: (1) a credit for capital expenditures for electric vehicle facilities or electric vehicle battery facilities; (2) a credit for educational or vocational training; and (3) a credit for qualified utility payments. Creates a credit for certain automobile manufacturers in an amount equal to 75% of withholding payments for new employees. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-ELECTRIC VEHICLE CREDIT
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Vella [D] | Rep. Maurice West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-09-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 232 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 233 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 234 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 235 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4155&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4155.htm |