IL HB4149 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Contains a statement of legislative findings. Amends the Attorney General Act. Provides that the Attorney General shall, no later than 6 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act, establish and maintain a sexual harassment in the workplace hotline with a toll-free telephone with voicemail capabilities and an Internet website through which persons may report instances of sexual harassment. Provides that the Attorney General shall develop the hotline in consultation with the Illinois Coalition Against Sexual Assault and the American Civil Liberties Union of Illinois. Provides that the Attorney General shall help persons who access the hotline find counseling and protective services, and assist in the filing of sexual harassment complaints through appropriate agencies. Provides that the Attorney General shall advertise the hotline and encourage reporting by both those who are subject to sexual harassment and those who have witnessed it. Provides that the hotline shall provide the means through which persons may anonymously report sexual harassment in both private and public places of employment. Provides that in the case of sexual harassment by a State employee, the Attorney General shall, with the permission of the reporting individual, further investigate the allegations. Provides that the Attorney General shall, if warranted, make recommendations to the appropriate entity for corrective action. Provides that each State employer shall post and keep posted, in conspicuous places on the premises of the employer where notices to employees are customarily posted, a notice informing employees of the sexual harassment in the workplace hotline, and that the Attorney General shall ensure compliance with this requirement. Provides that the Attorney General shall adopt rules to implement the new provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
SEXUAL HARASSMENT HOTLINE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-11-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-06 | House | First Reading |
2017-11-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 205 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 205 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4149&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4149.htm |