IL HB4147 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-10)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also commits aggravated battery when, in committing a battery, other than by the discharge of a firearm, he or she knowingly causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to an individual whom the person knows to be a Department of Children and Family Services employee: (1) performing his or her official duties; (2) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (3) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that a violation is a Class 1 felony. Provides that a person also commits aggravated battery when, in committing a battery, other than by discharge of a firearm, he or she knows the individual battered to be a Department of Children and Family Services employee: (1) performing his or her official duties; (2) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (3) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that a violation is a Class 2 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-AGG BAT DCFS EMPLOYEE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-01-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-11-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-11-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-11-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-11-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-11-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-11-06HouseFirst Reading
2017-11-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-3.05Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback