IL HB4142 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Newborn Metabolic Screening Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to provide all newborns and infants within 12 months of birth with screening tests for the presence of spinal muscular atrophy. Provides that the testing shall begin within 12 months of the occurrence of specified events. Provides that the Department is authorized to implement an additional fee for the screening prior to beginning the testing in order to accumulate the resources for start-up and other costs associated with implementation of the screening and thereafter to support the costs associated with screening and follow-up programs for spinal muscular atrophy.
Title
SPINAL MUSCULAR ATROPHY SCREEN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-01-31 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2017-10-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-10-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-10-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4142&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4142.htm |