IL HB4142 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Newborn Metabolic Screening Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to provide all newborns and infants within 12 months of birth with screening tests for the presence of spinal muscular atrophy. Provides that the testing shall begin within 12 months of the occurrence of specified events. Provides that the Department is authorized to implement an additional fee for the screening prior to beginning the testing in order to accumulate the resources for start-up and other costs associated with implementation of the screening and thereafter to support the costs associated with screening and follow-up programs for spinal muscular atrophy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SPINAL MUSCULAR ATROPHY SCREEN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-01-31HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-11-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-11-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-11-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-11-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-10-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2017-10-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-10-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-10-26HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-10-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4102403.35New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback