IL HB4138 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-19 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Police Act. Provides that preference for the hiring of a Department of State Police officer shall be given to the son, daughter, stepson, stepdaughter, grandson, granddaughter, brother, or sister of a law enforcement officer who was killed in the line of duty. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PREFERENCE HIRING STATE POLICE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-01-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-11-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-11-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-10-26HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady
2017-10-26HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-10-26HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-10-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-10-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-10-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-10-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-10-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-10-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-10-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-10-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback