IL HB4138 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Police Act. Provides that preference for the hiring of a Department of State Police officer shall be given to the son, daughter, stepson, stepdaughter, grandson, granddaughter, brother, or sister of a law enforcement officer who was killed in the line of duty. Effective immediately.
Title
PREFERENCE HIRING STATE POLICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2017-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-11-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-10-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-10-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-10-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-10-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-10-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-10-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2610 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4138&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4138.htm |