IL HB4135 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Provides that a county may require a commercial solar energy facility to be sited 500 feet (rather than 50 feet) to the nearest point on the property line of a nonparticipating property and 500 feet (rather than 150 feet) from the nearest point on the outside wall of an occupied community building or dwelling on nonparticipating properties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COUNTY-SOLAR FACILITY SETBACKS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-19HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2024-04-17HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2024-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2024-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-02-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-006-000
2024-01-31HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2023-10-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-10-18HouseFirst Reading
2023-09-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5555-12020Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback