IL HB4134 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides for the implementation of a sexual harassment training program to be completed by specified State officials and employees, and to be conducted by the appropriate State agency of those State officials and employees. Provides additional requirements for operation of the program, and for reporting and completion of sexual harassment training under the program. Authorizes the Legislative Ethics Commission to make rulings, issue recommendations, and impose administrative fines in connection with findings of sexual harassment. Authorizes the Legislative Inspector General to receive and investigate allegations of sexual harassment. Requires ethics officers to provide guidance to officers and employees in registering complaints about sexual harassment with the Legislative Inspector General. Provides for sexual harassment complaint procedures. Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Requires the Secretary of State to receive and investigate allegations of sexual harassment, and to immediately transmit those allegations to the Secretary of State Inspector General. Provides that each natural person required to register as a lobbyist under the Act must complete a program of sexual harassment training no later than 30 days after registration or renewal of registration under the Act. Defines terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ETHICS-SEX HARASSMENT TRAINING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-11-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-10-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-10-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-10-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251702Amended CodeCitation Text
251704.7New CodeSee Bill Text
251707Amended CodeCitation Text
54301-5Amended CodeCitation Text
543025-15Amended CodeCitation Text
543025-20Amended CodeCitation Text
543025-23Amended CodeCitation Text
543025-50aNew CodeSee Bill Text
54305-13New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback