IL HB4134 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides for the implementation of a sexual harassment training program to be completed by specified State officials and employees, and to be conducted by the appropriate State agency of those State officials and employees. Provides additional requirements for operation of the program, and for reporting and completion of sexual harassment training under the program. Authorizes the Legislative Ethics Commission to make rulings, issue recommendations, and impose administrative fines in connection with findings of sexual harassment. Authorizes the Legislative Inspector General to receive and investigate allegations of sexual harassment. Requires ethics officers to provide guidance to officers and employees in registering complaints about sexual harassment with the Legislative Inspector General. Provides for sexual harassment complaint procedures. Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Requires the Secretary of State to receive and investigate allegations of sexual harassment, and to immediately transmit those allegations to the Secretary of State Inspector General. Provides that each natural person required to register as a lobbyist under the Act must complete a program of sexual harassment training no later than 30 days after registration or renewal of registration under the Act. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
ETHICS-SEX HARASSMENT TRAINING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-11-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-10-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-10-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | First Reading |
2017-10-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 170 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 170 | 4.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 170 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 25-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 25-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 25-23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 25-50a | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | 5-13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4134&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4134.htm |