IL HB4133 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall reimburse epilepsy specialists, as defined by the Department by rule, who are authorized by Illinois law to provide epilepsy treatment services to persons with epilepsy or related disorders via telehealth. Provides that the Department shall establish, by rule, a method to reimburse providers for epilepsy treatment services provided by telehealth. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-TELEHEALTH-EPILEPSY
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4133&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4133.htm |