IL HB4132 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0920
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0920
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Provides that the Parking Excise Tax does not apply to: (1) a parking area or garage operated by the State, a State university, or a unit of local government; (2) the purchase of a parking space by the State, a State university, or a unit of local government for use by employees of the State, State university, or unit of local government; (3) a parking space leased to a governmental entity for use by the public; or (4) a parking area or garage owned and operated by a person engaged in the business of renting real estate and used by the lessee to park motor vehicles, recreational vehicles, or self-propelled vehicles for the lessee's own use. Effective immediately.
Title
PARKING TAX-STATE FAIR EXEMPT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0920 |
2022-05-27 | House | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-09 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-09 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-09 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-000 |
2022-04-09 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 017-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-04-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-002-000 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-006-000 |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2022-02-17 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra Hamilton |
2022-01-27 | House | To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-08-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 525 | 10-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |