IL HB4131 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on October 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Transparency in Economic Development Incentives Act. Provides that any tax incentives given to the company Amazon.com, Inc., by the Department of Revenue for the development of a corporate headquarters office in this State shall be limited to no more than $50,000 for each job opportunity created by the development. Provides that the Department shall have all the powers necessary to implement the Act, including the adoption of rules. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AMAZON-TAX INCENTIVE CAP

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-01-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-10-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-10-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback