IL HB4129 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension for an ordinance adopted on July 1, 1995 by the Village of Caseyville. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TIF-VILLAGE OF CASEYVILLE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 99 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 099-007-000
2018-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-23HouseArrived in House
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-002-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 005-000-000
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-006-000
2018-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-10-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-10-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-74.4-3.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback