IL HB4129 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1031
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1031
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension for an ordinance adopted on July 1, 1995 by the Village of Caseyville. Effective immediately.
Title
TIF-VILLAGE OF CASEYVILLE
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Sen. William Haine [D] |
Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 99 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1031 |
2018-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2018 |
2018-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 099-007-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-002-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-006-000 |
2018-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-10-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | First Reading |
2017-10-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |