IL HB4125 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on August 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also commits a hate crime if by reason of the actual or perceived employment as a peace officer of another individual, regardless of the existence of any other motivating factor or factors, he or she commits assault, battery, aggravated assault, misdemeanor theft, criminal trespass to residence, misdemeanor criminal damage to property, criminal trespass to vehicle, criminal trespass to real property, mob action, disorderly conduct, harassment by telephone, or harassment through electronic communications. Provides that a first offense is a Class 4 felony and a second or subsequent offense is a Class 2 felony, unless committed in certain specified locations in which case the penalty is a Class 3 felony for a first offense and a Class 2 felony for a second or subsequent offense.
Title
CRIM CD-HATE CRIME-POLICE
Sponsors
Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
Rep. Michael Kelly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-12-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-11-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-09-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-08-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-08-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-7.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4125&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4125.htm |