IL HB4120 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning unlawful use of weapons. Provides that 120 days after the effective date of the bill, it is unlawful for a person to knowingly import, sell, manufacture, transfer, or possess, in this State, a bump-fire stock for a semi-automatic firearm that does not convert the semi-automatic firearm into a machine gun. Defines "bump-fire stock" as a butt stock designed to be attached to a semi-automatic firearm and designed, made, or altered, and intended to increase the rate of fire achievable with the firearm to that of a fully automatic firearm by using the energy from the recoil of the firearm to generate reciprocating action that facilitates repeated activation of the trigger. Provides that a violation is a Class 4 felony. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-BAN BUMP-FIRE STOCK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-02-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-01-31HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-01-31HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-12-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-11-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-10-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-10-25HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-10-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-10-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-10-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-10-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-24HouseFirst Reading
2017-10-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-10-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720524-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback