IL HB4120 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning unlawful use of weapons. Provides that 120 days after the effective date of the bill, it is unlawful for a person to knowingly import, sell, manufacture, transfer, or possess, in this State, a bump-fire stock for a semi-automatic firearm that does not convert the semi-automatic firearm into a machine gun. Defines "bump-fire stock" as a butt stock designed to be attached to a semi-automatic firearm and designed, made, or altered, and intended to increase the rate of fire achievable with the firearm to that of a fully automatic firearm by using the energy from the recoil of the firearm to generate reciprocating action that facilitates repeated activation of the trigger. Provides that a violation is a Class 4 felony. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-BAN BUMP-FIRE STOCK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-01-31 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-01-31 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-12-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-10-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-10-25 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-10-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-10-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | First Reading |
2017-10-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-10-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4120&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4120.htm |