IL HB4114 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the No Taxpayer Funding for Abortion Act. Provides that neither the State nor any of its subdivisions may authorize the use of, appropriate, or expend funds to pay for an abortion or to cover any part of the costs of a health plan that includes coverage of abortion or to provide or refer for an abortion, unless a woman who suffers from a physical disorder, physical injury, or physical illness that would, as certified by a physician, place the woman in danger of death if an abortion is not performed. Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971 and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Excludes from the programs of health benefits and services authorized under those Acts coverage for elective abortions as provided in the No Taxpayer Funding for Abortion Act. Prohibits a physician who has been found guilty of performing an abortion procedure in a willful and wanton manner upon a woman who was not pregnant when the abortion procedure was performed from participating in the State's Medical Assistance Program. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall require a written statement, including the required opinion of a physician, to accompany a claim for reimbursement for abortions or induced miscarriages or premature births. Makes other changes. Amends the Problem Pregnancy Health Services and Care Act. Permits the Department of Human Services to make grants to nonprofit agencies and organizations that do not use those grants to refer or counsel for, or perform, abortions. Contains provisions regarding applicability and preempts home rule. Effective on the earlier of the effective date of Public Act 100-538 or June 1, 2018.
Title
NO TAXPAYER FUNDING ABORTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-10-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-10-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2017-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-10-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 6-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 230 | 4-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4114&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4114.htm |