IL HB4111 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the following items are exempt from the taxes under those Acts when purchased for use by a person who (i) is 65 years of age or older and (ii) receives medical assistance under Article V of the Illinois Public Aid Code or assistance under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program: (1) food for human consumption that is to be consumed off the premises where it is sold; (2) prescription and nonprescription medicines, drugs, and medical appliances; (3) medical devices by the United States Food and Drug Administration that are used for cancer treatment pursuant to a prescription, as well as any accessories and components related to those devices; and (4) insulin, urine testing materials, syringes, and needles used by diabetics, for human use. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-SENIOR CITIZENS
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D] | Rep. Silvana Tabares [D] |
Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Anna Moeller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-10-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-10-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 2-5.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4111&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4111.htm |