IL HB4111 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the following items are exempt from the taxes under those Acts when purchased for use by a person who (i) is 65 years of age or older and (ii) receives medical assistance under Article V of the Illinois Public Aid Code or assistance under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program: (1) food for human consumption that is to be consumed off the premises where it is sold; (2) prescription and nonprescription medicines, drugs, and medical appliances; (3) medical devices by the United States Food and Drug Administration that are used for cancer treatment pursuant to a prescription, as well as any accessories and components related to those devices; and (4) insulin, urine testing materials, syringes, and needles used by diabetics, for human use. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.





2017-10-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-10-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-10-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-10-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-10-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-10-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351052-5.1New CodeSee Bill Text
351103-5.1New CodeSee Bill Text
351153-5.1New CodeSee Bill Text
351202-5.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

Bill Comments