IL HB4111 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-20 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-20 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Lobbyist Registration Act. Prohibits a person subject to the Act from accepting compensation from a State agency or community college for lobbying executive, legislative, or administrative action. Exempts the salaries of full-time State or community college employees with responsibilities or authority other than lobbying. Effective immediately.
Title
LOBBYIST-NO STATE AGENCIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-04-02 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4111&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4111.htm |