IL HB4108 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Water Reclamation District (MWRD) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that an employee who first enters service on or after January 1, 2013 and becomes disabled shall, on and after the 31st day of disability, be entitled to ordinary disability benefits during the remainder of that disability, provided all sick leave is exhausted. Provides that if employee contributions (including interest to the date of withdrawal) in the account of an employee who enters service on or after January 1, 2013 have not, before his or her death and the death of his or her spouse, been paid as a retirement, spouse's, or child's annuity, then a refund shall be paid in an amount equal to the excess of the contributions over the amounts paid on those annuities. Specifies that if there are surviving children of the employee or annuitant who are eligible for a child's annuity, then that refund may not be paid until the youngest eligible child reaches age 23.
Title
PEN CD-MWRD-DISABILITY/REFUNDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2012-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 13-310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 13-601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4108&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4108.htm |