IL HB4107 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. In provisions concerning intradivisional transfers, provides that persons committed to Department of Corrections facilities or Department of Juvenile Justice facilities may make a request to be transferred to another facility at every 6 months.
Title
DOC-TRANSFER REQUEST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-07-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-10-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-8-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |