IL HB4107 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes it unlawful to deliver, sell, or purchase or cause to be delivered, sold, or purchased or cause to be possessed by another, an assault weapon, assault weapon attachment, .50 caliber rifle, or .50 caliber cartridge. Makes it unlawful for any person to knowingly possess an assault weapon, .50 caliber rifle, or .50 caliber cartridge 300 days after the effective date of this amendatory Act, except possession of weapons registered with the State Police in the time provided. Provides exemptions and penalties. Prohibits delivery, sale, purchase, or possession of large capacity ammunition feeding devices. Provides exemptions and penalties. Prohibits the knowing sale, manufacture, purchase, possession, or carrying of a trigger modification device. Defines "trigger modification device". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD ASSAULT WEAPONS; BAN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-15HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-10-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-10-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-10-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-10-11HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-10-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-10-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-10-10HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-10-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-10-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-10-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-10-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-10-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-10-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-10-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-10-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-10-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-10-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-10-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-10-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-10-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-10-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-10-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720524-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1.10New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-1.9New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback