IL HB4107 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes it unlawful to deliver, sell, or purchase or cause to be delivered, sold, or purchased or cause to be possessed by another, an assault weapon, assault weapon attachment, .50 caliber rifle, or .50 caliber cartridge. Makes it unlawful for any person to knowingly possess an assault weapon, .50 caliber rifle, or .50 caliber cartridge 300 days after the effective date of this amendatory Act, except possession of weapons registered with the State Police in the time provided. Provides exemptions and penalties. Prohibits delivery, sale, purchase, or possession of large capacity ammunition feeding devices. Provides exemptions and penalties. Prohibits the knowing sale, manufacture, purchase, possession, or carrying of a trigger modification device. Defines "trigger modification device". Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD ASSAULT WEAPONS; BAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-10-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-10-17 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-10-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-10-11 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-10-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-10-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-10-10 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-10-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-10-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-10-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-10-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-10-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-10-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-10-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4107&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4107.htm |