IL HB4106 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Cemetery Oversight Act from January 1, 2021 to January 1, 2031. Effective immediately.
Title
CEMETERY OVERSIGHT ACT-SUNSET
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 80 | 4.31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |