IL HB4105 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-18 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act and the Invest in Kids Act. Provides that the Invest in Kids credit applies permanently (currently, the credit applies for taxable years ending before January 1, 2023). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INVEST IN KIDS-SUNSET

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-10-18HouseFirst Reading
2023-10-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2023-09-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2023-09-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2023-09-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
2023-09-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
2023-09-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
2023-09-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2023-07-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
2023-07-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant
2023-07-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2023-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
2023-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2023-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
2023-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga
2023-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2023-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
2023-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2023-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
2023-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
2023-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
2023-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
2023-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
2023-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
2023-06-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin McLaughlin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
354040Amended CodeCitation Text
354065Amended CodeCitation Text
355224Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback