IL HB4105 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Defines "professional breeder". Provides that an animal shelter shall not accept a dog or cat from an owner, animal shelter, or out-of-state animal control facility unless it obtains documentation attesting the dog or cat was not obtained through compensation or payment made to a cat breeder, dog breeder, dog dealer, or dog broker. Provides that a pet shop operator or dog dealer shall submit records to the Department of Agriculture that attests that dogs offered for sale are not obtained from a puppy mill. Provides conditions dog breeders must satisfy relating to primary enclosures, breeding practices, veterinary care, socialization, retirement, and recordkeeping. Provides that dog dealers must comply with disclosure requirements when offering a dog or cat for sale. Increases fees for licenses issued under the Act.
Title
ANIMAL WELFARE-BREEDER-SHELTER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-04 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 605 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 2.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 3.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 605 | 3.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 3.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 605 | 3.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4105&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4105.htm |