IL HB4104 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Auditing Law of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that audit reports reporting on the financial position and results of financial operations for each fund of the municipality shall be consistent with either the accrual or cash basis of accounting depending upon the system followed by each municipality and shall otherwise be in accordance with generally accepted accounting principles (currently, shall be in accordance with generally accepted accounting principles, insofar as possible).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI CD-AUDIT REPORT STANDARDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-30HouseArrived in House
2018-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-05-29SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 005-000-000
2018-05-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-29SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-28SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2018-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter
2018-05-24SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kyle McCarter
2018-05-16SenatePostponed - Local Government
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-04-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-18SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2018-04-17HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Government Transparency Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Government Transparency Committee; 006-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Government Transparency Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Government Transparency Committee
2017-12-15HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-11-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-10-24HouseAssigned to Government Transparency Committee
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-09-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6558-8-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback