IL HB4104 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Auditing Law of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that audit reports reporting on the financial position and results of financial operations for each fund of the municipality shall be consistent with either the accrual or cash basis of accounting depending upon the system followed by each municipality and shall otherwise be in accordance with generally accepted accounting principles (currently, shall be in accordance with generally accepted accounting principles, insofar as possible).
Title
MUNI CD-AUDIT REPORT STANDARDS
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Keith Sommer [R] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] |
Sen. Kyle McCarter [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2018-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Government Transparency Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Government Transparency Committee; 006-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Government Transparency Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Government Transparency Committee |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-10-24 | House | Assigned to Government Transparency Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-09-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 8-8-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |