IL HB4102 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the approval to operate an automated traffic law enforcement system at an intersection shall be revoked by the municipality or county operating the automated traffic law enforcement system if the installation, operation, or request for approval to operate an automated traffic law enforcement system has been associated with civil or criminal corruption charges involving: (i) a State legislator; (ii) a member of the executive branch having oversight authority over approvals to operate the automated traffic law enforcement system; or (iii) a member of municipal or county government who holds or held the power to vote for or to issue a local ordinance pertaining to the automated traffic law enforcement system. Makes corresponding changes.
Title
VEH CD–RED LIGHT CAMERA ETHICS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-12-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-09-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-08-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2021-08-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-08-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-08-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2021-08-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-08-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-08-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-08-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-08-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-06-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4102&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4102.htm |