IL HB4101 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act, Counties Code, Illinois Municipal Code, Metro-East Park and Recreation District Act, Local Mass Transit District Act, Regional Transportation Authority Act, and Water Commission Act of 1985. Provides that the amounts transferred into the Tax Compliance and Administration Fund shall be reduced from 2% to 1%.
Title
TAX COMPLIANCE FUND-TRANSFER
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. David Harris [R] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-03-01 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-12-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-12-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-12-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-12-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-11-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-11-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2017-10-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-09-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6z-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1006.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 1605 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3610 | 5.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3615 | 4.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3720 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |