IL HB4100 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-18)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Defines "retail health care facility". Creates provisions concerning workplace violence against nurses in specified medical facilities concerning notice, contacting law enforcement, and mental health services. Requires specified medical facilities to create a workplace violence prevention program with specified requirements. Provides whistleblower protections for any nurse of a specified medical facility if management retaliates against the nurse for certain actions. Provides appropriate cross references in the Department of Veterans Affairs Act, the University of Illinois Hospital Act, the MC/DD Act, the ID/DD Community Care Act, and the Hospital Licensing Act. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that Department of Corrections and Department of Juvenile Justice institutions or facilities shall provide notice and specified protections when a committed person is transferred out of the institution or facility to receive medical care and treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NURSES-VIOLENCE PREVENTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Pension Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 014-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-001-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-10-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-10-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-10-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-09-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11033010New CodeSee Bill Text
2028052.07Amended CodeCitation Text
210462-219New CodeSee Bill Text
210472-219New CodeSee Bill Text
210859.7New CodeSee Bill Text
2256555-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2256560-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2256585-10New CodeSee Bill Text
2256585-15New CodeSee Bill Text
2256585-20New CodeSee Bill Text
2256585-5New CodeSee Bill Text
22565Art. 85 headingNew CodeSee Bill Text
73053-6-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback