IL HB4096 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Reduces the trailer flat weight tax for maximum loads of 3,000 lbs and less from $118 to $18. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-TRAILER WEIGHT TAX

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2020-06-23HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2020-02-27HouseTo Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee
2020-02-18HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2020-01-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-01-16HouseFirst Reading
2020-01-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-819Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback