IL HB4096 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall require each Medicaid Managed Care Organization to list as preferred on the Medicaid Managed Care Organization's preferred drug list every pharmaceutical that is listed as preferred on the Department's preferred drug list. Provides that the Department shall not prohibit, or adopt any rules or policies that prohibit, a Medicaid Managed Care Organization from: (i) covering additional pharmaceuticals that are not listed on the Department's preferred drug list; or (ii) removing from the Medicaid Managed Care Organization's preferred drug list any prior approval requirements applicable under the Department's preferred drug list. Provides that the Department shall not require a Medicaid Managed Care Organization to utilize a single, statewide preferred drug list and shall not prohibit a plan from negotiating drug pricing concessions or rebates on any drug with pharmaceutical companies, unless otherwise required by federal law. Provides that no later than July 1, 2018, the Department shall develop a standardized format for all Medicaid Managed Care Organization preferred drug lists in cooperation with Medicaid Managed Care Organizations and stakeholders, including, but not limited to, community-based organizations, providers, and individuals or entities with expertise in drug formulary development. Requires each Medicaid Managed Care Organization to post its preferred drug list on its website without restricting access to enrolled members and to update the preferred drug list posted on its website within 2 business days of making any changes to the preferred drug list, including, but not limited to, any and all changes to requirements for prior approval. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-MCO-PREFERRED RX LIST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20HouseGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-21HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-009-000
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care; 007-002-000
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-037-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 009-006-000
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-01-30HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-12-15HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-10-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-10-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-10-26HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-26HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 010-006-000
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-10-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-09-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-09-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-09-20HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-09-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-09-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-09-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-09-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-09-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-09-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-09-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-09-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-09-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-09-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-09-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-09-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-16.11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback