IL HB4093 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $1,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Board of Higher Education for distribution as grants for Cooperative Work Study Programs to institutions of higher education, in addition to all other amounts appropriated for these purposes. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
$IBHE-COOP WORK STUDY PROGRAMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-11 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-12-01 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-03-03 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2009-03-03 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-03-03 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Biggins |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4093&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/PDF/09600HB4093.pdf |