IL HB4090 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on August 29 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a municipality or county may not collect any debt due or owing the municipality or county for a parking violation during any period of time that is 5 or more years after the date the first notice of violation is sent to the registered owner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI PARKING TICKET-5 YEARS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 008-001-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-08-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-208.3Amended CodeCitation Text
6551-2.1-8Amended CodeCitation Text
6551-2.2-55Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-80-2bNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback