IL HB4090 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a municipality or county may not collect any debt due or owing the municipality or county for a parking violation during any period of time that is 5 or more years after the date the first notice of violation is sent to the registered owner.
Title
MUNI PARKING TICKET-5 YEARS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 008-001-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-08-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 1-2.1-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 1-2.2-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-80-2b | New Code | See Bill Text |