IL HB4083 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Prohibits the State Board of Education, school districts, and elementary and secondary schools from requiring the teachers, other staff, or students of a school to wear a face mask due to the COVID-19 public health emergency disaster declared by the Governor pursuant to the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-COVID-19-MASK MANDATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-09-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-05-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-05-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4083&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4083.htm |