IL HB4082 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Prohibits a home rule county from imposing a tax on sweetened beverages based on volume sold. Provides that any county ordinance adopted on or before the effective date of the amendatory Act that imposes such a tax is void. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTIES CD-BEVERAGE TAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-10-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2017-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-09-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-08-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-08-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-08-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-08-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 31, 2017 |
2017-08-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-08-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-16 | House | First Reading |
2017-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-08-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-08-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-08-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-08-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-08-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4082&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4082.htm |