IL HB4081 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Call Center Worker and Consumer Protection Act. Provides that an employer that intends to relocate a call center or portions of a call center from Illinois to another state or a foreign country must provide notice to the State Treasurer at least 120 days before the relocation. Authorizes a civil penalty not to exceed $10,000 for violations. Requires the Treasurer to compile and post on the Treasurer's website a list of employers that have relocated call centers. Requires an employer that relocates a call center from Illinois to another state or a foreign country to repay grants, loans, and tax benefits that may have been received. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CALL CENTER WORKER ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-18SenatePostponed - Telecommunications and Information Technology
2018-05-18SenateDo Pass Telecommunications and Information Technology; 008-007-000
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenateAssigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology
2018-05-08SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-08SenateSponsorship Change Request Approved Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSponsorship Change Request Referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateRequest for Sponsorship Change Filed - Pursuant to Senate Rule 5-1
2018-05-03SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-03SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-19HouseVerified
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-049-000
2018-04-19HouseMotion Prevailed
2018-04-19HouseMotion - Move to Previous Question Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-10HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-03-08HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-03-06HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-03-06HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity Committee; 008-005-000
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to Economic Opportunity Committee
2017-08-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-08-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-08-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-08-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-08-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-08-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-08-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-08-16HouseFirst Reading
2017-08-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-08-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-08-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-08-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-08-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback