IL HB4080 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Introduced on August 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a unit of local government may not seek damages in connection with a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction based upon a constitutional challenge to a tax. Provides that if a petition is filed in violation of the new provisions, the court shall award the respondent reasonable attorney's fees and costs incurred in connection with the petition. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRO/INJUNCTION-DAMAGES-LOC GOV

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-08-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-08-16HouseFirst Reading
2017-08-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-08-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-08-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-08-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-08-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-08-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-08-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
735511-110Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback