IL HB4076 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-9)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act and the Invest in Kids Act. Provides that the Invest in Kids credit applies permanently (currently, the credit applies for taxable years ending before January 1, 2023). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INVEST IN KIDS-SUNSET

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-05-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
2021-05-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2021-05-21HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2021-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2021-05-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2021-05-19HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2021-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
2021-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2021-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2021-05-17HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2021-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2021-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2021-05-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-05-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2021-05-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2021-05-12HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2021-05-12HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2021-05-12HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-05-12HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-05-12HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2021-05-12HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2021-05-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
2021-05-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2021-05-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-05-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
2021-05-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
2021-05-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-05-07HouseFirst Reading
2021-05-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Grant

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
354040Amended CodeCitation Text
354065Amended CodeCitation Text
355224Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback