IL HB4071 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that the Act may be referred to as the AJ Freund Act. Provides that any report received by the Department of Children and Family Services alleging the abuse or neglect of a child by a person who is not the child's parent, a member of the child's immediate family, a person responsible for the child's welfare, an individual residing in the same home as the child, or a paramour of the child's parent shall immediately be shared with (rather than referred to) the appropriate local law enforcement agency for consideration of criminal investigation or other action. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall be the primary agency (rather than sole agency) responsible for receiving and investigating reports of child abuse or neglect made under the Act, except where investigations by other agencies may be required. In a provision requiring the Department to allow law enforcement personnel to concurrently investigate with the Department reports of suspected child abuse or neglect, provides that the Department's completed investigative report shall be shared with the office of the State's Attorney of the involved county.
Title
AJ FREUND ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Weber [R] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Blaine Wilhour [R] | Rep. Chris Bos [R] |
Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] | Rep. Mark Luft [R] | Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] |
Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Steven Reick [R] | Rep. James Durkin [R] | Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] |
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Weber |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Weber |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Weber |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 7.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |