IL HB4067 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARM OWNERS ID ACT-REPEAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2020-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2020-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2020-01-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2020-01-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2020-01-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2020-01-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2020-01-21HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2020-01-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2020-01-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2020-01-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2020-01-16HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Darren Bailey
2020-01-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2020-01-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2020-01-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2020-01-14HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2020-01-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2020-01-14HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2020-01-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2020-01-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2020-01-14HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2020-01-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2020-01-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-01-13HouseFirst Reading
2020-01-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2020-01-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.6Amended CodeCitation Text
105510-27.1AAmended CodeCitation Text
105534-8.05Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-120Repealed CodeCitation Text
2026052605-300Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-45Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-595Amended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in partAmended CodeCitation Text
20260555a-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2026302.2Amended CodeCitation Text
2252102005Amended CodeCitation Text
22544735-30Amended CodeCitation Text
22544735-35Amended CodeCitation Text
301056z-99Amended CodeCitation Text
40556-103.1Amended CodeCitation Text
40556-103.2Amended CodeCitation Text
40556-103.3Amended CodeCitation Text
410452Amended CodeCitation Text
43065ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
43066105Amended CodeCitation Text
4306625Amended CodeCitation Text
4306630Amended CodeCitation Text
4306640Amended CodeCitation Text
4306670Amended CodeCitation Text
4306680Amended CodeCitation Text
430685-20Amended CodeCitation Text
430685-25Amended CodeCitation Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
507101Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.2Amended CodeCitation Text
52053.2aAmended CodeCitation Text
720512-3.05Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-4Amended CodeCitation Text
720516-0.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720516C-2Amended CodeCitation Text
720517-30Amended CodeCitation Text
72052-7.1Amended CodeCitation Text
72052-7.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1.6Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-1.8Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-2Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3.2Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3.4Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-3BAmended CodeCitation Text
720524-4.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-4.5New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-9Amended CodeCitation Text
72064610Amended CodeCitation Text
7255102-7.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-10Amended CodeCitation Text
7255112A-11.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7255112A-11.2Amended CodeCitation Text
7255112A-14Amended CodeCitation Text
7255112A-14.7Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-4.5-110Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-3Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-3.2Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-6-3Amended CodeCitation Text
74011012Amended CodeCitation Text
7402180Amended CodeCitation Text
75060210Amended CodeCitation Text
75060214Amended CodeCitation Text
76510251Amended CodeCitation Text
765102615-705Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback