IL HB4062 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Defines "online real estate database provider". Provides that if an online real estate database provider includes, in its information concerning residential real property located in the State of Illinois, certain information on the quality of schools in which the residential real property is located, the online real estate database provider must use the most recent information available prepared by the State Board of Education. Provides that a violation of those provisions is an unlawful practice within the meaning of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONS FRAUD-SCHOOL DATA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-06-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-06-21HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8155052TTTNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback