IL HB4062 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act and Illinois Vehicle Code to provide for the issuance of Support Illinois Carry license plates. Creates the Support Illinois Carry Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that the applicant shall pay an additional fee of $40 for original issuance of the plates, of which $25 shall be deposited into the Support Illinois Carry Fund and $15 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that an additional fee of $27 shall be charged for each renewal, of which $25 shall be deposited into the Support Illinois Carry Fund and $2 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that moneys in the Support Illinois Carry Fund shall be paid as grants to the Illinois State Rifle Association Legal Assistance Committee, Ltd., for promoting concealed carry in Illinois.
Title
VEH CD-CONCEALED CARRY PLATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-25 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.809 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4062&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4062.htm |