IL HB4060 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that the county clerk of a county where a decedent last resided shall (rather than may) issue certifications of death records from the electronic reporting system for death registrations and shall (rather than may) use that system to cancel the registration of any person who has died during the preceding month. Requires a county coroner, medical examiner, or physician for a county or any other individual responsible for certification of death under the Vital Records Act to promptly transmit certified records to the county clerk within 7 days after the death. Requires the county clerk and coroner to report quarterly to its affiliated county board and certify its full compliance with the provisions and accuracy of the voter rolls. Allows an individual to request a copy of the county clerk's or coroner's report and allows for relief if the county clerk fails to provide an accurate report within specified timeframes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CODE-DECEASED VOTER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2020-01-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2020-01-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2020-01-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2020-01-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2020-01-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2020-01-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-01-13HouseFirst Reading
2020-01-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1054-14.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback