IL HB4058 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House State Government Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Central Management Services to develop a recycling program to be implemented in all buildings owned, operated, or leased by the State of Illinois. Provides that the Department shall adopt rules as necessary to implement the recycling program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CMS-RECYCLING PROGRAM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
2020-03-17HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-01-13HouseFirst Reading
2020-01-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Edly-Allen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20405405-217New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback